Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB184 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Johnson (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 184
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 9, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 9, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the cancellation of a special election to fill a vacancy
 in the legislature.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2.055, Election Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 2.055.  SPECIAL ELECTION TO FILL VACANCY IN
 LEGISLATURE. (a)  The secretary of state shall [may] declare an
 unopposed candidate elected to fill a vacancy in the legislature
 if:
 (1)  each candidate for an office that is to appear on
 the ballot is unopposed; and
 (2)  no proposition is to appear on the ballot.
 (b)  The declaration under Subsection (a) shall be made on
 the second day after:
 (1)  the last date an application for a place on the
 special election ballot may be filed; or
 (2)  the date of a withdrawal, death, or final judgment
 of ineligibility of a candidate that causes the remaining candidate
 to be unopposed.
 (c)  After [If] a declaration is made under Subsection (a),
 the election is not held. A copy of the declaration shall be posted
 on election day at each polling place that would have been used in
 the election.
 (d)  At the same time a declaration is made under Subsection
 (a), the [(c)  The] secretary of state shall issue a certificate of
 election to each candidate in the same manner as provided for a
 candidate elected at the election.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *