House | 05/09/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3527 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2086 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform | Journal Page: 1907 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 1907 | |
House | 03/07/2011 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 688 | |
House | 03/07/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 688 | |
House | 02/25/2011 | Filed |