Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1884 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            82R7599 TJB-D
 By: Garza H.B. No. 1884


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the determination of the market value of a residence
 homestead for ad valorem taxation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 25.18, Tax Code, is amended by amending
 Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (b-1), (b-2), and (b-3) to
 read as follows:
 (b)  The plan shall provide for the following reappraisal
 activities for all real and personal property in the district at
 least once every three years, except as provided by Subsections
 (b-1), (b-2), and (b-3):
 (1)  identifying properties to be appraised through
 physical inspection or by other reliable means of identification,
 including deeds or other legal documentation, aerial photographs,
 land-based photographs, surveys, maps, and property sketches;
 (2)  identifying and updating relevant characteristics
 of each property in the appraisal records;
 (3)  defining market areas in the district;
 (4)  identifying property characteristics that affect
 property value in each market area, including:
 (A)  the location and market area of property;
 (B)  physical attributes of property, such as
 size, age, and condition;
 (C)  legal and economic attributes; and
 (D)  easements, covenants, leases, reservations,
 contracts, declarations, special assessments, ordinances, or legal
 restrictions;
 (5)  developing an appraisal model that reflects the
 relationship among the property characteristics affecting value in
 each market area and determines the contribution of individual
 property characteristics;
 (6)  applying the conclusions reflected in the model to
 the characteristics of the properties being appraised; and
 (7)  reviewing the appraisal results to determine
 value.
 (b-1)  The plan shall provide for the reappraisal of a
 residence homestead not more often than once every three years. The
 market value of a residence homestead may not be increased for a tax
 year in which the property is not appraised.  The plan may not
 prevent the chief appraiser from reappraising a residence homestead
 in a year in which the housing market is down.
 (b-2)  Subsection (b-1) does not apply to the appraisal of a
 residence homestead in the tax year in which a limitation on
 appraised value under Section 23.23(a) expires.
 (b-3)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b-1), at any time during
 a tax year before the date the chief appraiser submits the completed
 appraisal records to the appraisal review board under Section
 25.22, an owner of a residence homestead is entitled to a
 reappraisal of the owner's residence homestead for that year on
 written request delivered to the chief appraiser.
 SECTION 2.  Section 403.302(d), Government Code, as amended
 by Chapters 1186 (H.B. 3676) and 1328 (H.B. 3646), Acts of the 81st
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, is reenacted and amended to
 read as follows:
 (d)  For the purposes of this section, "taxable value" means
 the market value of all taxable property less:
 (1)  the total dollar amount of any residence homestead
 exemptions lawfully granted under Section 11.13(b) or (c), Tax
 Code, in the year that is the subject of the study for each school
 district;
 (2)  one-half of the total dollar amount of any
 residence homestead exemptions granted under Section 11.13(n), Tax
 Code, in the year that is the subject of the study for each school
 district;
 (3)  the total dollar amount of any exemptions granted
 before May 31, 1993, within a reinvestment zone under agreements
 authorized by Chapter 312, Tax Code;
 (4)  subject to Subsection (e), the total dollar amount
 of any captured appraised value of property that:
 (A)  is within a reinvestment zone created on or
 before May 31, 1999, or is proposed to be included within the
 boundaries of a reinvestment zone as the boundaries of the zone and
 the proposed portion of tax increment paid into the tax increment
 fund by a school district are described in a written notification
 provided by the municipality or the board of directors of the zone
 to the governing bodies of the other taxing units in the manner
 provided by Section 311.003(e), Tax Code, before May 31, 1999, and
 within the boundaries of the zone as those boundaries existed on
 September 1, 1999, including subsequent improvements to the
 property regardless of when made;
 (B)  generates taxes paid into a tax increment
 fund created under Chapter 311, Tax Code, under a reinvestment zone
 financing plan approved under Section 311.011(d), Tax Code, on or
 before September 1, 1999; and
 (C)  is eligible for tax increment financing under
 Chapter 311, Tax Code;
 (5)  the total dollar amount of any captured appraised
 value of property that:
 (A)  is within a reinvestment zone:
 (i)  created on or before December 31, 2008,
 by a municipality with a population of less than 18,000; and
 (ii)  the project plan for which includes
 the alteration, remodeling, repair, or reconstruction of a
 structure that is included on the National Register of Historic
 Places and requires that a portion of the tax increment of the zone
 be used for the improvement or construction of related facilities
 or for affordable housing;
 (B)  generates school district taxes that are paid
 into a tax increment fund created under Chapter 311, Tax Code; and
 (C)  is eligible for tax increment financing under
 Chapter 311, Tax Code;
 (6)  the total dollar amount of any exemptions granted
 under Section 11.251 or 11.253, Tax Code;
 (7)  the difference between the comptroller's estimate
 of the market value and the productivity value of land that
 qualifies for appraisal on the basis of its productive capacity,
 except that the productivity value estimated by the comptroller may
 not exceed the fair market value of the land;
 (8)  the portion of the appraised value of residence
 homesteads of individuals who receive a tax limitation under
 Section 11.26, Tax Code, on which school district taxes are not
 imposed in the year that is the subject of the study, calculated as
 if the residence homesteads were appraised at the full value
 required by law;
 (9)  a portion of the market value of property not
 otherwise fully taxable by the district at market value because of:
 (A)  action required by statute or the
 constitution of this state that, if the tax rate adopted by the
 district is applied to it, produces an amount equal to the
 difference between the tax that the district would have imposed on
 the property if the property were fully taxable at market value and
 the tax that the district is actually authorized to impose on the
 property, if this subsection does not otherwise require that
 portion to be deducted; or
 (B)  action taken by the district under Subchapter
 B or C, Chapter 313, Tax Code, before the expiration of the
 subchapter;
 (10)  the market value of all tangible personal
 property, other than manufactured homes, owned by a family or
 individual and not held or used for the production of income;
 (11)  the appraised value of property the collection of
 delinquent taxes on which is deferred under Section 33.06, Tax
 Code;
 (12)  the portion of the appraised value of property
 the collection of delinquent taxes on which is deferred under
 Section 33.065, Tax Code; [and]
 (13)  the amount by which the market value of a
 residence homestead to which Section 23.23, Tax Code, applies
 exceeds the appraised value of that property as calculated under
 that section; and
 (14)  the amount by which the market value of a
 residence homestead to which Section 25.18(b-1), Tax Code, applies
 exceeds the appraised value of that property because of the
 application of Section 25.18(b-1).
 SECTION 3.  Section 403.302(m), Government Code, as added by
 Chapter 1186 (H.B. 3676), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2009, is amended to conform to Section 80, Chapter 1328
 (H.B. 3646), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009,
 to read as follows:
 (m)  Subsection (d)(9) [(d)(10)] does not apply to property
 that was the subject of an application under Subchapter B or C,
 Chapter 313, Tax Code, made after May 1, 2009, that the comptroller
 recommended should be disapproved.
 SECTION 4.  To the extent of any conflict, this Act prevails
 over another Act of the 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011,
 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
 codes.
 SECTION 5.  This Act applies only to the determination of the
 appraised value of a residence homestead for ad valorem taxation
 for a tax year that begins on or after the effective date of this
 Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2012.