Senate | 05/13/2011 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 2306 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2306 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2273 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3968 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3707 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Record vote | RV#1023 | Journal Page: 3706 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3706 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3706 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3640 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3640 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1866 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 689 | |
House | 03/07/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 689 | |
House | 02/28/2011 | Filed |