Senate | 05/16/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2371 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2371 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2315 | |
House | 05/15/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4063 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3906 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1071 | Journal Page: 3906 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3906 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3906 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Amended | 2-Gallego | Journal Page: 3904 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3902 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3783 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Amended | 8-Martinez Fischer | Journal Page: 3782 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Amendment adopted as amended | 1-T. Smith | Journal Page: 3782 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Amendment amended | 7-Callegari | Journal Page: 3782 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Amendment to amendment withdrawn | 2-Callegari | Journal Page: 3782 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 3782 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Amendment withdrawn | 5-Martinez Fischer | Journal Page: 3781 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3781 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Postponed | 5/12/11 4:00 PM | Journal Page: 3710 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Postponed | 5/11/11 7:00 PM | Journal Page: 3612 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Point of order withdrawn | Journal Page: 3612 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | 5-Martinez Fischer | Journal Page: 3611 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3611 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Amended | 4-Madden | Journal Page: 3611 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Amendment adopted as amended | 1-T. Smith | Journal Page: 3610 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Amendment amended | 2-Callegari | Journal Page: 3610 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3608 | |
House | 05/07/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2171 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2011 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 327 | |
House | 02/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 327 | |
House | 11/08/2010 | Filed |