House
|
05/04/2011
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 2852
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
SB 1716
|
Journal Page: 2851
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/4/11 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2363
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2363
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Postponed
|
4/28/11 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1768
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 689
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 689
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|