Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
House
|
05/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4063
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3928
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1087
|
Journal Page: 3928
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3928
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3928
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3806
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3806
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Corrected comm. report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2796
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Subcommittee meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2011
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 313
|
House
|
02/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 313
|
House
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|