1 | 1 | | By: Kefler (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 1901 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2011; |
---|
3 | 3 | | April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | Natural Resources; May 4, 2011, reported favorably by the |
---|
5 | 5 | | following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 4, 2011, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to the applicability of provisions concerning bond |
---|
11 | 11 | | approval by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality to |
---|
12 | 12 | | certain water entities. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Sections 49.181(a) and (h), Water Code, are |
---|
15 | 15 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (a) A district may not issue bonds unless the commission |
---|
17 | 17 | | determines that the project to be financed by the bonds is feasible |
---|
18 | 18 | | and issues an order approving the issuance of the bonds. This |
---|
19 | 19 | | section does not apply to: |
---|
20 | 20 | | (1) refunding bonds if the commission issued an order |
---|
21 | 21 | | approving the issuance of the bonds or notes that originally |
---|
22 | 22 | | financed the project; |
---|
23 | 23 | | (2) refunding bonds that are issued by a district |
---|
24 | 24 | | under an agreement between the district and a municipality allowing |
---|
25 | 25 | | the issuance of the district's bonds to refund bonds issued by the |
---|
26 | 26 | | municipality to pay the cost of financing facilities; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (3) bonds issued to and approved by the Farmers Home |
---|
28 | 28 | | Administration, the United States Department of Agriculture, the |
---|
29 | 29 | | North American Development Bank, or the Texas Water Development |
---|
30 | 30 | | Board; [or] |
---|
31 | 31 | | (4) refunding bonds issued to refund bonds described |
---|
32 | 32 | | by Subdivision (3); or |
---|
33 | 33 | | (5) bonds issued by a public utility agency created |
---|
34 | 34 | | under Chapter 572, Local Government Code, any of the public |
---|
35 | 35 | | entities participating in which are districts if at least one of |
---|
36 | 36 | | those districts is a district described by Subsection (h)(1)(E). |
---|
37 | 37 | | (h) This section does not apply to: |
---|
38 | 38 | | (1) a district if: |
---|
39 | 39 | | (A) [(1)] the district's boundaries include one |
---|
40 | 40 | | entire county; |
---|
41 | 41 | | (B) [(2)] the district was created by a special |
---|
42 | 42 | | Act of the legislature and: |
---|
43 | 43 | | (i) [(A)] the district is located entirely |
---|
44 | 44 | | within one county; |
---|
45 | 45 | | (ii) [(B)] the district is located entirely |
---|
46 | 46 | | within one or more home-rule municipalities; |
---|
47 | 47 | | (iii) [(C)] the total taxable value of the |
---|
48 | 48 | | real property and improvements to the real property zoned by one or |
---|
49 | 49 | | more home-rule municipalities for residential purposes and located |
---|
50 | 50 | | within the district does not exceed 25 percent of the total taxable |
---|
51 | 51 | | value of all taxable property in the district, as shown by the most |
---|
52 | 52 | | recent certified appraisal tax roll prepared by the appraisal |
---|
53 | 53 | | district for the county; and |
---|
54 | 54 | | (iv) [(D)] the district was not required by |
---|
55 | 55 | | law to obtain commission approval of its bonds before the effective |
---|
56 | 56 | | date of this section; |
---|
57 | 57 | | (C) [(3)] the district is a special water |
---|
58 | 58 | | authority; |
---|
59 | 59 | | (D) [(4)] the district is governed by a board of |
---|
60 | 60 | | directors appointed in whole or in part by the governor, a state |
---|
61 | 61 | | agency, or the governing body or chief elected official of a |
---|
62 | 62 | | municipality or county and does not provide, or propose to provide, |
---|
63 | 63 | | water, sewer, drainage, reclamation, or flood control services to |
---|
64 | 64 | | residential retail or commercial customers as its principal |
---|
65 | 65 | | function; or |
---|
66 | 66 | | (E) [(5)] the district on September 1, 2003: |
---|
67 | 67 | | (i) [(A)] is a municipal utility district |
---|
68 | 68 | | that includes territory in only two counties; |
---|
69 | 69 | | (ii) [(B)] has outstanding long-term |
---|
70 | 70 | | indebtedness that is rated BBB or better by a nationally recognized |
---|
71 | 71 | | rating agency for municipal securities; and |
---|
72 | 72 | | (iii) [(C)] has at least 5,000 active water |
---|
73 | 73 | | connections; or |
---|
74 | 74 | | (2) a public utility agency created under Chapter 572, |
---|
75 | 75 | | Local Government Code, any of the public entities participating in |
---|
76 | 76 | | which are districts if at least one of those districts is a district |
---|
77 | 77 | | described by Subdivision (1)(E). |
---|
78 | 78 | | SECTION 2. Section 49.052(f), Water Code, is amended to |
---|
79 | 79 | | read as follows: |
---|
80 | 80 | | (f) This section shall not apply to special water |
---|
81 | 81 | | authorities, districts described in Section 49.181(h)(1)(D) |
---|
82 | 82 | | [49.181(h)(4)], or a district where the principal function of the |
---|
83 | 83 | | district is to provide irrigation water to agricultural lands or to |
---|
84 | 84 | | provide nonpotable water for any purpose. |
---|
85 | 85 | | SECTION 3. Section 49.183(d), Water Code, is amended to |
---|
86 | 86 | | read as follows: |
---|
87 | 87 | | (d) A district's bonds are negotiable instruments within |
---|
88 | 88 | | the meaning and purposes of the Business & Commerce Code. A |
---|
89 | 89 | | district's bonds may be issued and bear interest in accordance with |
---|
90 | 90 | | Chapters 1201, 1204, and 1371, Government Code, and Subchapters |
---|
91 | 91 | | A-C, Chapter 1207, Government Code. Except for this subsection, |
---|
92 | 92 | | this section does not apply to special water authorities or |
---|
93 | 93 | | districts described in Section 49.181(h)(1)(D) [49.181(h)(4)]. |
---|
94 | 94 | | SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act does not apply |
---|
95 | 95 | | to bonds for which an application and report were submitted to the |
---|
96 | 96 | | Texas Commission on Environmental Quality under Section 49.181(b), |
---|
97 | 97 | | Water Code, before the effective date of this Act. Those bonds are |
---|
98 | 98 | | governed by the law as it existed immediately before the effective |
---|
99 | 99 | | date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that |
---|
100 | 100 | | purpose. |
---|
101 | 101 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
102 | 102 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
103 | 103 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
104 | 104 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
105 | 105 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
106 | 106 | | * * * * * |
---|