1 | 1 | | By: Madden (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 1908 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2011; |
---|
3 | 3 | | April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | Criminal Justice; May 12, 2011, reported favorably by the |
---|
5 | 5 | | following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 12, 2011, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to student loan repayment assistance for certain providers |
---|
11 | 11 | | of correctional health care. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Section 61.532, Education Code, is amended to |
---|
14 | 14 | | read as follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | Sec. 61.532. ELIGIBILITY. [(a)] To be eligible to receive |
---|
16 | 16 | | repayment assistance, a physician must: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (1) apply to the coordinating board; |
---|
18 | 18 | | (2) at the time of application, be licensed to |
---|
19 | 19 | | practice medicine under Subtitle B, Title 3, Occupations Code; |
---|
20 | 20 | | (3) have completed one, two, three, or four |
---|
21 | 21 | | consecutive years of practice in a health professional shortage |
---|
22 | 22 | | area designated by the Department of State Health Services; and |
---|
23 | 23 | | (4) provide health care services to: |
---|
24 | 24 | | (A) recipients under the medical assistance |
---|
25 | 25 | | program authorized by Chapter 32, Human Resources Code; [or] |
---|
26 | 26 | | (B) enrollees under the child health plan program |
---|
27 | 27 | | authorized by Chapter 62, Health and Safety Code; or |
---|
28 | 28 | | (C) persons committed to a secure correctional |
---|
29 | 29 | | facility operated by or under contract with the Texas Youth |
---|
30 | 30 | | Commission or persons confined in a secure correctional facility |
---|
31 | 31 | | operated by or under contract with any division of the Texas |
---|
32 | 32 | | Department of Criminal Justice. |
---|
33 | 33 | | SECTION 2. Section 61.533, Education Code, is amended to |
---|
34 | 34 | | read as follows: |
---|
35 | 35 | | Sec. 61.533. LIMITATION. (a) A physician may receive |
---|
36 | 36 | | repayment assistance grants for not more than four years. |
---|
37 | 37 | | (b) Repayment assistance grants paid in relation to |
---|
38 | 38 | | services described by Section 61.532(4)(C) are limited to the first |
---|
39 | 39 | | 10 physicians who establish eligibility for those grants each year. |
---|
40 | 40 | | SECTION 3. Subchapter E, Chapter 501, Government Code, is |
---|
41 | 41 | | amended by adding Section 501.156 to read as follows: |
---|
42 | 42 | | Sec. 501.156. STUDENT LOAN REPAYMENT ASSISTANCE. (a) From |
---|
43 | 43 | | funds appropriated for purposes of correctional managed health |
---|
44 | 44 | | care, the committee may provide student loan repayment assistance |
---|
45 | 45 | | for medical and mental health care physicians and other staff |
---|
46 | 46 | | providing correctional managed health care. The repayment |
---|
47 | 47 | | assistance may be applied to any student loan received through any |
---|
48 | 48 | | lender for education at a public or accredited private institution |
---|
49 | 49 | | of higher education in the United States, including loans for |
---|
50 | 50 | | undergraduate, graduate, and medical education. |
---|
51 | 51 | | (b) The committee may adopt rules to implement this section, |
---|
52 | 52 | | including rules governing eligibility for the loan repayment |
---|
53 | 53 | | assistance and the terms of contracts between the committee and |
---|
54 | 54 | | recipients of the loan repayment assistance. In adopting those |
---|
55 | 55 | | rules, the committee shall consider the requirements of Subchapter |
---|
56 | 56 | | J, Chapter 61, Education Code, and the rules of the Texas Higher |
---|
57 | 57 | | Education Coordinating Board adopted under that subchapter. |
---|
58 | 58 | | (c) A physician may not receive loan repayment assistance |
---|
59 | 59 | | under both this section and Subchapter J, Chapter 61, Education |
---|
60 | 60 | | Code. |
---|
61 | 61 | | (d) Not later than December 1 of each state fiscal year, the |
---|
62 | 62 | | committee shall submit a report to the Legislative Budget Board and |
---|
63 | 63 | | the governor on the use of funds under this section for the |
---|
64 | 64 | | preceding fiscal year. |
---|
65 | 65 | | SECTION 4. The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board |
---|
66 | 66 | | shall: |
---|
67 | 67 | | (1) not later than December 1, 2011, adopt any rules |
---|
68 | 68 | | necessary under Sections 61.532 and 61.533, Education Code, as |
---|
69 | 69 | | amended by this Act; and |
---|
70 | 70 | | (2) not later than January 1, 2012, begin providing as |
---|
71 | 71 | | permitted by those sections student loan repayment assistance to |
---|
72 | 72 | | providers of health care in secure correctional facilities. |
---|
73 | 73 | | SECTION 5. The Correctional Managed Health Care Committee |
---|
74 | 74 | | shall: |
---|
75 | 75 | | (1) not later than December 1, 2011, adopt the rules |
---|
76 | 76 | | for the provision of student loan repayment assistance under |
---|
77 | 77 | | Section 501.156, Government Code, as added by this Act; and |
---|
78 | 78 | | (2) not later than January 1, 2012, begin providing |
---|
79 | 79 | | student loan repayment assistance under that section. |
---|
80 | 80 | | SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
81 | 81 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
82 | 82 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
83 | 83 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
84 | 84 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
85 | 85 | | * * * * * |
---|