Senate | 04/20/2011 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 1275 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1275 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1006 | |
House | 04/08/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1662 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1581 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Record vote | RV#294 | Journal Page: 1581 |
House | 04/07/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1581 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1581 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1559 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1559 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 728 | |
House | 03/02/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/02/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/02/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/23/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/23/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/23/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2011 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 328 | |
House | 02/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 328 | |
House | 11/08/2010 | Filed |