Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4374
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4374
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4374
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 6234
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 6234
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 6234
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5760
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3556
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3556
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3556
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3556
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3556
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3556
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3556
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 3320
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1705
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1705
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1366
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2392
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#511
|
Journal Page: 2194
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2194
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2194
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2177
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2184
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2184
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1098
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Corrections
|
|
Journal Page: 693
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 693
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|