House | 05/11/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3582 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 647 | Journal Page: 3578 |
House | 05/10/2011 | Postponed | 5/11/11 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 3402 |
House | 05/10/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3402 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2171 | |
House | 04/12/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/08/2011 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 709 | |
House | 03/08/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 709 | |
House | 03/01/2011 | Filed |