E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4576
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6414
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1657
|
Journal Page: 6414
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6394
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6456
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4562
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4382
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5398
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5398
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3482
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3482
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3338
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3338
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3338
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5018
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5018
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5018
|
House
|
05/22/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4615
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2706
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2706
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2706
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2706
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2705
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2705
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2705
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA5 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 2705
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 2705
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2695
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2695
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2510
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2302
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 2278
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2278
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2278
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Recalled from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3860
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Senate adopts recall resolution
|
HCR 161
|
Journal Page: 2275
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
House adopts resolution recalling from Senate
|
HCR 161
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 2266
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2266
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2237
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3636
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#980
|
Journal Page: 3635
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3635
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Amended
|
13-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 3633
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
12-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 3632
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3629
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3623
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/11/11 5:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#947
|
Journal Page: 3517
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3517
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
59-Gutierrez
|
Journal Page: 3513
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
58-Veasey
|
Journal Page: 3512
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3512
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3506
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
53-McClendon
|
Journal Page: 3506
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
54-Perry
|
Journal Page: 3506
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
53-McClendon
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Amended
|
45-Truitt
|
Journal Page: 3496
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
|
24-Alonzo
|
Journal Page: 3456
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
1-L. Taylor
|
Journal Page: 3452
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3418
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/10/11 8:25 PM
|
Journal Page: 3402
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3402
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1835
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 709
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 709
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|