E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/20/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4766
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2385
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
House discharges conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2385
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3995
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1111
|
Journal Page: 3995
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3995
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
House discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3995
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3299
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3299
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2141
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 2141
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1925
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1925
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1925
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3038
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3038
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#778
|
Journal Page: 3038
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 3038
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2549
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1508
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1508
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1508
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1508
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1507
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1507
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1507
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Carona
|
Journal Page: 1507
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1507
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1507
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1278
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1278
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1012
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1663
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#294
|
Journal Page: 1584
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1584
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1584
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1566
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Thompson
|
Journal Page: 1566
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1566
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1115
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 694
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 694
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|