Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1959 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Thompson (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 1959
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 18, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 18, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to appeal of the certification of an area's wet or dry
 status.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.37, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this code, if the
 county clerk, city secretary, or city clerk certifies that the
 location or address given in the application is not in a wet area or
 refuses to issue the certification required by this section, the
 applicant is entitled to a hearing before the county judge to
 contest the certification or refusal to certify. The applicant
 must submit a written request to the county judge for a hearing
 under this subsection. The county judge shall conduct a hearing
 required by this subsection not later than the 30th day after the
 date the county judge receives the written request.
 SECTION 2.  Section 61.37, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this code, if the
 county clerk, city secretary, or city clerk certifies that the
 location or address given in the application is not in a wet area or
 refuses to issue the certification required by this section, the
 applicant is entitled to a hearing before the county judge to
 contest the certification or refusal to certify. The applicant
 must submit a written request to the county judge for a hearing
 under this subsection. The county judge shall conduct a hearing
 required by this subsection not later than the 30th day after the
 date the county judge receives the written request.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 11.37(d) and 61.37(d), Alcoholic
 Beverage Code, as added by this Act, apply only to a certification
 issued or a refusal to certify made by a county clerk, city
 secretary, or city clerk on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *