Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1965 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Kolkhorst, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Deuell) H.B. No. 1965
22 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2011;
33 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
44 and Human Services; May 11, 2011, reported favorably by the
55 following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 11, 2011, sent to printer.)
66
77
88 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
99 AN ACT
1010 relating to the expansion of faith- and community-based health and
1111 human services initiatives.
1212 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1313 SECTION 1. Section 535.051, Government Code, is amended by
1414 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
1515 follows:
1616 (b) The chief administrative officer of each of the
1717 following state agencies, in consultation with the governor, shall
1818 designate one employee from the agency to serve as a liaison for
1919 faith- and community-based organizations:
2020 (1) the Texas Department [Office] of Rural [Community]
2121 Affairs;
2222 (2) the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality;
2323 (3) the Texas Department of Criminal Justice;
2424 (4) the Texas Department of Housing and Community
2525 Affairs;
2626 (5) the Texas Education Agency;
2727 (6) the Texas Juvenile Probation Commission;
2828 (7) the Texas Veterans Commission;
2929 (8) the Texas Workforce Commission;
3030 (9) the Texas Youth Commission;
3131 (10) the office of the governor;
3232 (11) the Department of Public Safety;
3333 (12) the Texas Department of Insurance;
3434 (13) the Public Utility Commission of Texas;
3535 (14) the office of the attorney general;
3636 (15) the Department of Agriculture;
3737 (16) the office of the comptroller;
3838 (17) the Department of Information Resources;
3939 (18) the Office of State-Federal Relations;
4040 (19) the office of the secretary of state; and
4141 (20) [(10)] other state agencies as determined by the
4242 governor.
4343 (c) The commissioner of higher education, in consultation
4444 with the presiding officer of the interagency coordinating group,
4545 shall designate one employee from an institution of higher
4646 education, as that term is defined under Section 61.003, Education
4747 Code, to serve as a liaison for faith- and community-based
4848 organizations.
4949 SECTION 2. Sections 535.053(a) and (b), Government Code,
5050 are amended to read as follows:
5151 (a) The interagency coordinating group for faith- and
5252 community-based initiatives is composed of each faith- and
5353 community-based liaison designated under Section 535.051 and a
5454 liaison from the State Commission on National and Community
5555 Service. The commission shall provide administrative support to
5656 the interagency coordinating group.
5757 (b) The liaison from the State Commission on National and
5858 Community Service [commission employee designated as a liaison
5959 under Section 535.051] is the presiding officer of the interagency
6060 coordinating group. If the State Commission on National and
6161 Community Service is abolished, the liaison from the governor's
6262 office is the presiding officer of the interagency coordinating
6363 group.
6464 SECTION 3. Section 535.054, Government Code, is amended to
6565 read as follows:
6666 Sec. 535.054. REPORT [REPORTS]. (a) Not later than
6767 December 1 of each year, the interagency coordinating group shall
6868 submit a report to the legislature that describes in detail the
6969 activities, goals, and progress of the interagency coordinating
7070 group. [A liaison designated under Section 535.051 shall:
7171 [(1) provide periodic reports to the executive
7272 commissioner or other chief executive officer who designated the
7373 liaison, as applicable, on a schedule determined by the person who
7474 designated the liaison; and
7575 [(2) report annually to the governor's office of
7676 faith- and community-based initiatives and as necessary to the
7777 State Commission on National and Community Service regarding the
7878 liaison's efforts to comply with the duties imposed under Sections
7979 535.052 and 535.053.]
8080 (b) The [Each] report made under Subsection (a) [(a)(2)]
8181 must be made available to the public through posting on the office
8282 of the governor's Internet website[, and the reports may be
8383 aggregated into a single report for that purpose].
8484 SECTION 4. Subchapter B, Chapter 535, Government Code, is
8585 amended by adding Section 535.055 to read as follows:
8686 Sec. 535.055. TASK FORCE ON IMPROVING RELATIONS WITH
8787 NONPROFITS. (a) The interagency coordinating group task force is
8888 established to help direct the interagency coordinating group in
8989 carrying out the group's duties under this section. The commission
9090 shall provide administrative support to the task force.
9191 (b) The executive commissioner, in consultation with the
9292 presiding officer of the interagency coordinating group, shall
9393 appoint as members of the task force one representative from each of
9494 the following groups and entities:
9595 (1) a statewide nonprofit organization;
9696 (2) local governments;
9797 (3) faith-based groups;
9898 (4) community-based groups;
9999 (5) consultants to nonprofit corporations;
100100 (6) experts in grant writing; and
101101 (7) a statewide association of nonprofit
102102 organizations.
103103 (c) In addition to the interagency coordinating group's
104104 other duties, the interagency coordinating group, in coordination
105105 with the task force, shall:
106106 (1) develop and implement a plan for improving
107107 contracting relationships between state agencies and faith- and
108108 community-based organizations;
109109 (2) develop best practices for cooperating and
110110 collaborating with faith- and community-based organizations;
111111 (3) identify and address duplication of services
112112 provided by the state and faith- and community-based organizations;
113113 and
114114 (4) identify and address gaps in state services that
115115 faith- and community-based organizations could fill.
116116 (d) The task force shall prepare a report describing actions
117117 taken or not taken by the interagency coordinating group under this
118118 section and include in the report any recommendations relating to
119119 legislation necessary to address an issue identified by the group
120120 under this section. The task force shall present the report to the
121121 House Committee on Human Services or its successor, the House
122122 Committee on Public Health or its successor, and the Senate Health
123123 and Human Services Committee or its successor not later than
124124 September 1, 2012.
125125 (e) This section expires September 1, 2013.
126126 SECTION 5. Not later than October 1, 2011, the executive
127127 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
128128 appoint members to the interagency coordinating group task force in
129129 accordance with Section 535.055, Government Code, as added by this
130130 Act.
131131 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
132132 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
133133 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
134134 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
135135 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
136136 * * * * *