Senate | 05/09/2011 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2144 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2144 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2054 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3202 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2968 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Record vote | RV#745 | Journal Page: 2967 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 2967 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Amended | 1-Alonzo | Journal Page: 2967 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2967 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2890 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2890 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2890 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2264 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 695 | |
House | 03/07/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 695 | |
House | 03/01/2011 | Filed |