Senate | 04/26/2011 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1339 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1339 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1141 | |
House | 04/15/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1909 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1800 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1798 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Record vote | RV#375 | Journal Page: 1800 |
House | 04/14/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1800 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1800 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1787 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1787 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1151 | |
House | 03/22/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 696 | |
House | 03/07/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 696 | |
House | 03/01/2011 | Filed |