E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6915
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1642
|
Journal Page: 6360
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6358
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6455
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4538
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4383
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5959
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5959
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3778
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3778
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2809
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2809
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2809
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4690
|
|
05/21/2011
|
House appoints conferees with instructions
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4690
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4690
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4218
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2555
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2555
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2555
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2555
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2555
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2555
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2555
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2269
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1082
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1082
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 840
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1374
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#163
|
Journal Page: 1130
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1130
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1130
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1122
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1122
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 941
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2011
|
Referred to Corrections
|
|
Journal Page: 328
|
House
|
02/11/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 328
|
House
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|