E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5117
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4339
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6078
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1576
|
Journal Page: 6079
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6078
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5752
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3537
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3537
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3537
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3537
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3537
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3537
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3537
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2612
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 1426
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1426
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1385
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2392
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2291
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#566
|
Journal Page: 2291
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2291
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2291
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2246
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#537
|
Journal Page: 2246
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2246
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2246
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1641
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Corrections
|
|
Journal Page: 697
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 697
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|