Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2007 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Shelton (Senate Sponsor - Davis) H.B. No. 2007
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 13, 2011, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 13, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to payment by the Benbrook Water Authority for certain
 damages caused by the authority's operation of a sanitary sewer
 system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 123, Acts of the 54th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 1955, is amended by adding Section 5A to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 5A.  CERTAIN DAMAGES CAUSED BY SEWAGE BACKUP. (a)  The
 Authority may pay actual property damages caused by the backup of
 the Authority's sanitary sewer system regardless of whether the
 Authority would be liable for the damages under Chapter 101, Civil
 Practice and Remedies Code.
 (b)  This section does not waive governmental immunity from
 suit or liability.
 SECTION 2.  Section 5A, Chapter 123, Acts of the 54th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1955, as added by this Act, applies
 only to damages caused by the backup of a sanitary sewer system on
 or after September 1, 2011.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *