E | 06/17/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6918 | |
E | 05/20/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4766 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2609 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4181 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4338 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4121 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2381 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2381 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2381 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2381 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2381 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2381 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2381 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2195 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1705 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1705 | |
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1366 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2392 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Record vote | RV#511 | Journal Page: 2194 |
House | 04/26/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2194 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2194 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2177 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2184 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2184 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1227 | |
House | 03/22/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 699 | |
House | 03/07/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 699 | |
House | 03/02/2011 | Filed |