Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3330
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2509
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 1746
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1746
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1297
|
House
|
04/25/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#503
|
Journal Page: 2149
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2149
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2149
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2142
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2142
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2142
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1909
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 699
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 699
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|