Senate | 05/16/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 2188 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2188 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2054 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3202 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2970 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Record vote | RV#747 | Journal Page: 2969 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2969 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2969 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2891 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2891 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2391 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1106 | |
House | 03/07/2011 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 699 | |
House | 03/07/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 699 | |
House | 03/02/2011 | Filed |