House | 05/06/2011 | Postponed | 7/4/11 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 3134 |
House | 05/06/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3134 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Postponed | 5/6/11 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 3060 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3060 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Postponed | 5/5/11 12:01 AM | Journal Page: 2907 |
House | 05/04/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2907 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2391 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 700 | |
House | 03/07/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 700 | |
House | 03/02/2011 | Filed |