E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4576
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6371
|
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1649
|
Journal Page: 6371
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6368
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4562
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4375
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5962
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5962
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5555
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5555
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5555
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4614
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Deuell
|
Journal Page: 2628
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2628
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2628
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2509
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2054
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#749
|
Journal Page: 2971
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2971
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2971
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2892
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2892
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2324
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 710
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 710
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|