House | 05/03/2011 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Corrected comm. report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | Journal Page: 2796 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2323 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/08/2011 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 710 | |
House | 03/08/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 710 | |
House | 03/02/2011 | Filed |