House | 05/04/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3092 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 1908 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 1908 | |
House | 04/15/2011 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 04/15/2011 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/08/2011 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 712 | |
House | 03/08/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 712 | |
House | 03/02/2011 | Filed |