Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2109 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Truitt (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 2109
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2011;
 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 18, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 18, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to agency action concerning assisted living facilities,
 including regulation of inappropriate placement of residents at
 facilities; providing a penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 247.066, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (b-1), (d-1), (d-2), (f), (g), and
 (h) and amending Subsections (c), (d), and (e) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  If a facility identifies a resident who the facility
 believes is inappropriately placed at the facility, the facility is
 not required to move the resident if the facility obtains the
 written statements and waiver prescribed by Subsection (c).
 (c)  If [a department inspector determines that] a resident
 is inappropriately placed at a facility, the facility is not
 required to move the resident if, not later than the 10th business
 day after the date that the facility determines or is informed of
 the department's [of the specific basis of the inspector's]
 determination that a resident is inappropriately placed at the
 facility, the facility:
 (1)  obtains a written assessment from a physician that
 the resident is appropriately placed;
 (2)  obtains a written statement:
 (A)  from the resident that the resident wishes to
 remain in the facility; or
 (B)  from a family member of the resident that the
 family member wishes for the resident to remain in the facility, if
 the resident lacks capacity to give a statement under this
 subsection;
 (3)  states in writing that the facility wishes for the
 resident to remain in the facility; and
 (4)  applies for and obtains a waiver from the
 department of all applicable requirements for evacuation that the
 facility does not meet with respect to the resident, if the facility
 does not meet all requirements for the evacuation of residents with
 respect to the resident.
 (d)  If the [a] department [inspector] determines that a
 resident is inappropriately placed at a facility and the facility
 either agrees with the determination or does not obtain the written
 statements and waiver prescribed by Subsection (c) that would allow
 the resident to remain in the facility [notwithstanding the
 determination of the inspector, the department may not assess an
 administrative penalty against the facility because of the
 inappropriate placement. However], the facility shall discharge
 the resident. The resident is allowed 30 days after the date of
 discharge to move from the facility. A discharge required under
 this subsection must be made notwithstanding:
 (1)  any other law, including any law relating to the
 rights of residents and any obligations imposed under the Property
 Code; and
 (2)  the terms of any contract.
 (d-1)  If a facility is required to discharge the resident
 because the facility has not obtained the written statements
 prescribed by Subsection (c) or the department does not approve a
 waiver based on the written statements submitted, the department
 may:
 (1)  assess an administrative penalty against the
 facility if the facility intentionally or repeatedly disregards
 department criteria for obtaining a waiver for inappropriate
 placement of a resident;
 (2)  seek an emergency suspension or closing order
 against the facility under Section 247.042 if the department
 determines there is a significant risk to the residents of the
 facility and an immediate threat to the health and safety of the
 residents; or
 (3)  seek other sanctions against the facility under
 Subchapter C in lieu of an emergency suspension or closing order if
 the department determines there is a significant risk to a resident
 of the facility and an immediate threat to the health and safety of
 a resident.
 (d-2)  The executive commissioner by rule shall develop
 criteria under which the department may determine when a facility
 has intentionally or repeatedly disregarded the waiver process.
 (e)  To facilitate obtaining the written statements required
 under Subsections (b-1) and (c)(1)-(3), the department shall
 develop standard forms that must be used under Subsections (b-1) or
 (c)(1)-(3), as appropriate. The department shall develop criteria
 under which the department will determine, based on a resident's
 specific situation, whether it will grant or deny a request for a
 waiver under Subsection (b-1) or (c)(4).
 (f)  The department shall ensure that each facility and
 resident is aware of the waiver process described by Subsection (c)
 for aging in place. A facility must include with the facility
 disclosure statement required under Section 247.026(b)(4)(B)
 information regarding the policies and procedures for aging in
 place described by this section.
 (g)  The department, in cooperation with assisted living
 service providers, shall develop cost-effective training regarding
 aging in place, retaliation, and other issues determined by the
 department.
 (h)  The department shall require surveyors, facility
 supervisors, and other staff, as appropriate, to complete the
 training described by Subsection (g) annually.
 SECTION 2.  Section 247.068, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  A department employee may not retaliate against an
 assisted living facility, an employee of an assisted living
 facility, or a person in control of an assisted living facility for:
 (1)  complaining about the conduct of a department
 employee;
 (2)  disagreeing with a department employee about the
 existence of a violation of this chapter or a rule adopted under
 this chapter; or
 (3)  asserting a right under state or federal law.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *