House | 05/03/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2796 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1598 | |
House | 03/08/2011 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 715 | |
House | 03/08/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 715 | |
House | 03/03/2011 | Filed |