Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2124 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Workman, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 2124
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 7, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 21, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 21, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to victim notification regarding the release of a
 defendant who was acquitted by reason of insanity in a criminal
 case.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 4(d)(8), Article 46.03, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is transferred to Subchapter A, Chapter 46C, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, redesignated as Article 46C.003, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, and amended to read as follows:
 Art. 46C.003.  VICTIM NOTIFICATION OF RELEASE [(8)     Victim
 Notification of Release].  If the court issues an order [under
 Subdivision (4) or (5)] that requires the release of an acquitted
 person on discharge or on a regimen of outpatient care, the clerk of
 the court issuing the order, using the information provided on any
 victim impact statement received by the court under Article 56.03
 or other information made available to the court, shall [provide
 name, address, and phone number information to the Texas Department
 of Criminal Justice victim services division to enable the division
 to] notify the victim or the victim's guardian or close relative of
 the release.  [The victim services division shall notify any victim
 or guardian or close relative named in the victim impact statement
 or other information.]   Notwithstanding Article 56.03(f), the
 clerk of the court may inspect a victim impact statement for the
 purpose of notification under this article [subdivision].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *