E | 06/17/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6918 | |
E | 05/26/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6284 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3772 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5417 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5964 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5386 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3326 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3326 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3326 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3326 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3326 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3326 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3326 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2509 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 2144 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2144 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2054 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3202 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Record vote | RV#750 | Journal Page: 2972 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2972 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2971 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2892 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2892 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2006 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/08/2011 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 716 | |
House | 03/08/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 716 | |
House | 03/03/2011 | Filed |