Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
H. refuses to adopt conf. comm. rept-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5083
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6609
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1708
|
Journal Page: 6608
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House refuses to adopt conference comm. rept.
|
|
Journal Page: 6604
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR2697
|
Journal Page: 6603
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6871
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5050
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR1257
|
Journal Page: 5050
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4643
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6281
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6281
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4327
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4327
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4031
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4031
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4031
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5942
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5942
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5942
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5394
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3404
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3404
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Lucio
|
Journal Page: 3404
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3404
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3404
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2970
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2612
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1338
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1338
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1236
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2092
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1916
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#423
|
Journal Page: 1915
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1915
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1915
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1896
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Amended
|
1-T. King
|
Journal Page: 1896
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1896
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1115
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2011
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 338
|
House
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 338
|
House
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|