Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2131 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Geren, et al (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 2131
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2011;
 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 5, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 5, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of a pass for expedited access to the State
 Capitol.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 411, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 411.0625 to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.0625.  PASS FOR EXPEDITED ACCESS TO CAPITOL.
 (a)  The department shall allow a person to enter the Capitol and
 the Capitol Extension, including any public space in the Capitol or
 Capitol Extension, in the same manner as the department allows
 entry to a person who presents a concealed handgun license under
 Subchapter H if the person:
 (1)  obtains from the department a Capitol access pass;
 and
 (2)  presents the pass to the appropriate law
 enforcement official when entering the building or a space within
 the building.
 (b)  To be eligible for a Capitol access pass, a person must
 meet the eligibility requirements applicable to a license to carry
 a concealed handgun under Subchapter H, other than requirements
 regarding evidence of handgun proficiency.
 (c)  The department shall adopt rules to establish a
 procedure by which a resident of the state may apply for and be
 issued a Capitol access pass.  Rules adopted under this section must
 include provisions for eligibility, application, approval,
 issuance, and renewal that:
 (1)  require the department to conduct the same
 background check on an applicant for a Capitol access pass that is
 conducted on an applicant for a concealed handgun license under
 Subchapter H;
 (2)  enable the department to conduct the background
 check described by Subdivision (1); and
 (3)  establish application and renewal fees in amounts
 sufficient to cover the cost of administering this section, not to
 exceed the amounts of similar fees required for a concealed handgun
 license under Section 411.174.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *