Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2133 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Solomons (Senate Sponsor - Fraser) H.B. No. 2133
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 28, 2011;
 May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 18, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 18, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Public Utility Commission of Texas' authority to
 disgorge revenue obtained as a result of certain violations;
 providing an administrative penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 15.023, Utilities Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 15.023.  ADMINISTRATIVE PENALTY, DISGORGEMENT ORDER,
 OR MITIGATION PLAN.
 SECTION 2.  Section 15.023, Utilities Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (e), (f), and (g) to read as follows:
 (e)  For a violation of Section 39.157, the commission shall,
 in addition to the assessment of a penalty, order disgorgement of
 all excess revenue resulting from the violation. For any other
 violation of the statutes, rules, or protocols relating to
 wholesale electric markets, the commission may, in addition to the
 assessment of a penalty, order disgorgement of all excess revenue
 resulting from the violation.
 (f)  The commission and a person may develop and enter into a
 voluntary mitigation plan relating to a violation of Section 39.157
 or rules adopted by the commission under that section. If the
 commission and a person enter into a voluntary mitigation plan,
 adherence to the plan constitutes an absolute defense against an
 alleged violation with respect to activities covered by the plan.
 (g)  In this subchapter, "excess revenue" means revenue in
 excess of revenue that would have occurred absent a violation.
 SECTION 3.  The heading to Section 15.024, Utilities Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 15.024. ADMINISTRATIVE PENALTY ASSESSMENT OR
 DISGORGEMENT ORDER PROCEDURE.
 SECTION 4.  Section 15.024(f), Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (f)  If the person requests a hearing or fails to timely
 respond to the notice, the executive director shall set a hearing
 and give notice of the hearing to the person. The parties to a
 proceeding under this subchapter shall be limited to the person and
 the commission, including the independent market monitor. The
 hearing shall be held by an administrative law judge of the State
 Office of Administrative Hearings. The administrative law judge
 shall make findings of fact and conclusions of law and promptly
 issue to the commission a proposal for a decision about the
 occurrence of the violation and the amount of a proposed penalty.
 Based on the findings of fact, conclusions of law, and proposal for
 a decision, the commission by order may find that a violation has
 occurred and impose a penalty or disgorgement order or may find that
 no violation occurred.
 SECTION 5.  Section 15.025, Utilities Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (e) and (f) to read as follows:
 (e)  Any excess revenue ordered disgorged under this section
 for a violation of the statutes, rules, or protocols relating to
 wholesale electric markets shall be returned to the affected
 wholesale electric market participants to be used to reduce costs
 or fees incurred by retail electric customers. The commission
 shall adopt rules to prescribe how revenue shall be returned to the
 affected wholesale electric market participants under this
 subsection.
 (f)  For purposes of this section and Section 15.026, a
 reference to a penalty shall be construed to include disgorgement.
 SECTION 6.  Sections 15.026(a) and (b), Utilities Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Judicial review of a commission order imposing an
 administrative penalty or disgorgement is:
 (1)  instituted by filing a petition as provided by
 Subchapter G, Chapter 2001, Government Code; and
 (2)  under the substantial evidence rule.
 (b)  If the court sustains the occurrence of the violation,
 the court may uphold or reduce the amount of the penalty or
 disgorgement and order the person to pay the full or reduced amount
 of the penalty or disgorgement. If the court does not sustain the
 occurrence of the violation, the court shall order that no penalty
 or disgorgement is owed.
 SECTION 7.  Section 39.157(a), Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The commission shall monitor market power associated
 with the generation, transmission, distribution, and sale of
 electricity in this state. On a finding that market power abuses or
 other violations of this section are occurring, the commission
 shall require reasonable mitigation of the market power by ordering
 the construction of additional transmission or distribution
 facilities, by seeking an injunction or civil penalties as
 necessary to eliminate or to remedy the market power abuse or
 violation as authorized by Chapter 15, by imposing an
 administrative penalty as authorized by Chapter 15, by ordering the
 disgorgement of excess revenue as authorized by Chapter 15, or by
 suspending, revoking, or amending a certificate or registration as
 authorized by Section 39.356. Section 15.024(c) does not apply to
 an administrative penalty imposed under this section. For purposes
 of this subchapter, market power abuses are practices by persons
 possessing market power that are unreasonably discriminatory or
 tend to unreasonably restrict, impair, or reduce the level of
 competition, including practices that tie unregulated products or
 services to regulated products or services or unreasonably
 discriminate in the provision of regulated services. For purposes
 of this section, "market power abuses" include predatory pricing,
 withholding of production, precluding entry, and collusion. A
 violation of the code of conduct provided by Subsection (d) that
 materially impairs the ability of a person to compete in a
 competitive market shall be deemed to be an abuse of market power.
 The possession of a high market share in a market open to
 competition may not, of itself, be deemed to be an abuse of market
 power; however, this sentence shall not affect the application of
 state and federal antitrust laws.
 SECTION 8.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a violation that occurs on or after the effective date of this Act.
 A violation that occurs before the effective date of this Act is
 covered by the law in effect at the time the violation occurred, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *