E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6460
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4346
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6275
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6459
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3716
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5642
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1483
|
Journal Page: 5643
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5642
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5040
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3025
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3025
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3025
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3025
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3025
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3025
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3025
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Zaffirini
|
Journal Page: 3025
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3025
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3025
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2306
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2306
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2054
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2943
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#722
|
Journal Page: 2943
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2943
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2943
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2926
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2926
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2324
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 814
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 814
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|