House | 05/07/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3202 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/14/2011 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 338 | |
House | 02/14/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 338 | |
House | 11/09/2010 | Filed |