Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB215 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Gallego, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 215
22 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 4, 2011;
33 May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
44 Justice; May 12, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
55 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 12, 2011, sent to printer.)
66
77
88 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
99 AN ACT
1010 relating to photograph and live lineup identification procedures in
1111 criminal cases.
1212 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1313 SECTION 1. Chapter 38, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
1414 amended by adding Article 38.20 to read as follows:
1515 Art. 38.20. PHOTOGRAPH AND LIVE LINEUP IDENTIFICATION
1616 PROCEDURES
1717 Sec. 1. In this article, "institute" means the Bill
1818 Blackwood Law Enforcement Management Institute of Texas located at
1919 Sam Houston State University.
2020 Sec. 2. This article applies only to a law enforcement
2121 agency of this state or of a county, municipality, or other
2222 political subdivision of this state that employs peace officers who
2323 conduct photograph or live lineup identification procedures in the
2424 routine performance of the officers' official duties.
2525 Sec. 3. (a) Each law enforcement agency shall adopt,
2626 implement, and as necessary amend a detailed written policy
2727 regarding the administration of photograph and live lineup
2828 identification procedures in accordance with this article. A law
2929 enforcement agency may adopt:
3030 (1) the model policy adopted under Subsection (b); or
3131 (2) the agency's own policy that, at a minimum,
3232 conforms to the requirements of Subsection (c).
3333 (b) The institute, in consultation with large, medium, and
3434 small law enforcement agencies and with law enforcement
3535 associations, scientific experts in eyewitness memory research,
3636 and appropriate organizations engaged in the development of law
3737 enforcement policy, shall develop, adopt, and disseminate to all
3838 law enforcement agencies in this state a model policy and
3939 associated training materials regarding the administration of
4040 photograph and live lineup identification procedures. The
4141 institute shall provide for a period of public comment before
4242 adopting the policy and materials.
4343 (c) The model policy or any other policy adopted by a law
4444 enforcement agency under Subsection (a) must:
4545 (1) be based on:
4646 (A) credible field, academic, or laboratory
4747 research on eyewitness memory;
4848 (B) relevant policies, guidelines, and best
4949 practices designed to reduce erroneous eyewitness identifications
5050 and to enhance the reliability and objectivity of eyewitness
5151 identifications; and
5252 (C) other relevant information as appropriate;
5353 and
5454 (2) address the following topics:
5555 (A) the selection of photograph and live lineup
5656 filler photographs or participants;
5757 (B) instructions given to a witness before
5858 conducting a photograph or live lineup identification procedure;
5959 (C) the documentation and preservation of
6060 results of a photograph or live lineup identification procedure,
6161 including the documentation of witness statements, regardless of
6262 the outcome of the procedure;
6363 (D) procedures for administering a photograph or
6464 live lineup identification procedure to an illiterate person or a
6565 person with limited English language proficiency;
6666 (E) for a live lineup identification procedure,
6767 if practicable, procedures for assigning an administrator who is
6868 unaware of which member of the live lineup is the suspect in the
6969 case or alternative procedures designed to prevent opportunities to
7070 influence the witness;
7171 (F) for a photograph identification procedure,
7272 procedures for assigning an administrator who is capable of
7373 administering a photograph array in a blind manner or in a manner
7474 consistent with other proven or supported best practices designed
7575 to prevent opportunities to influence the witness; and
7676 (G) any other procedures or best practices
7777 supported by credible research or commonly accepted as a means to
7878 reduce erroneous eyewitness identifications and to enhance the
7979 objectivity and reliability of eyewitness identifications.
8080 Sec. 4. (a) Not later than December 31 of each
8181 odd-numbered year, the institute shall review the model policy and
8282 training materials adopted under this article and shall modify the
8383 policy and materials as appropriate.
8484 (b) Not later than September 1 of each even-numbered year,
8585 each law enforcement agency shall review its policy adopted under
8686 this article and shall modify that policy as appropriate.
8787 Sec. 5. (a) Any evidence or expert testimony presented by
8888 the state or the defendant on the subject of eyewitness
8989 identification is admissible only subject to compliance with the
9090 Texas Rules of Evidence. Evidence of compliance with the model
9191 policy or any other policy adopted under this article or with the
9292 minimum requirements of this article is not a condition precedent
9393 to the admissibility of an out-of-court eyewitness identification.
9494 (b) Notwithstanding Article 38.23 as that article relates
9595 to a violation of a state statute, a failure to conduct a photograph
9696 or live lineup identification procedure in substantial compliance
9797 with the model policy or any other policy adopted under this article
9898 or with the minimum requirements of this article does not bar the
9999 admission of eyewitness identification testimony in the courts of
100100 this state.
101101 SECTION 2. (a) Not later than December 31, 2011, the Bill
102102 Blackwood Law Enforcement Management Institute of Texas shall
103103 develop, adopt, and disseminate the model policy and associated
104104 training materials required under Article 38.20, Code of Criminal
105105 Procedure, as added by this Act.
106106 (b) Not later than September 1, 2012, each law enforcement
107107 agency to which Article 38.20, Code of Criminal Procedure, as added
108108 by this Act, applies shall adopt a policy as required by that
109109 article.
110110 (c) The change in law made by Section 5, Article 38.20, Code
111111 of Criminal Procedure, as added by this Act, applies only to a
112112 photograph or live lineup identification procedure conducted on or
113113 after September 1, 2012, regardless of whether the offense to which
114114 the procedure is related occurred before, on, or after September 1,
115115 2012.
116116 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
117117 * * * * *