Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5677
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5677
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5677
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA6 Watson
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3061
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 3053
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3052
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3052
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2551
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2506
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2055
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#772
|
Journal Page: 2992
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2992
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2992
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2906
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Torres
|
Journal Page: 2906
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2906
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2323
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 719
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 719
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|