Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2550
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2266
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2266
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2237
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3551
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#959
|
Journal Page: 3551
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3551
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3550
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3406
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Elkins
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1908
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 721
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 721
|
House
|
03/04/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|