Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2193 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Truitt (Senate Sponsor - Duncan) H.B. No. 2193
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 20, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 20, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to service and qualifications for membership on an
 advisory committee established by the Employees Retirement System
 of Texas to provide advice to the board of trustees on investments
 and investment-related issues.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 815, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 815.5091, 815.5092, and 815.5093 to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 815.5091.  MEMBERSHIP ON ADVISORY COMMITTEE ON
 INVESTMENTS. (a)  The board of trustees may, under the investment
 duties delegated to the board by Section 67, Article XVI, Texas
 Constitution, establish an investment advisory committee as the
 board considers necessary to assist the board in its investment
 duties.
 (b)  A person appointed to serve as a member of an advisory
 committee established by the board of trustees to provide advice to
 the board on investments and investment-related issues must be:
 (1)  a person with expertise in the management of a
 financial institution or other business in which investment
 decisions are made; or
 (2)  a prominent educator in the field of economics,
 finance, or another investment-related area.
 (c)  A person appointed to serve as a member of a committee
 described by Subsection (b) shall assist the board of trustees in
 carrying out the board's fiduciary duties with regard to the
 investment of the assets of the retirement system and related
 duties under this chapter and Chapter 609.
 Sec. 815.5092.  INELIGIBILITY FOR MEMBERSHIP ON ADVISORY
 COMMITTEE ON INVESTMENTS. (a)  A person is not eligible for
 appointment to an advisory committee established by the board of
 trustees to provide advice to the board on investments and
 investment-related issues if the person or the person's spouse:
 (1)  is employed by or participates in the management
 of a business entity or other organization receiving funds from the
 retirement system;
 (2)  owns or controls, directly or indirectly, more
 than a 10 percent interest in a business entity or other
 organization receiving funds from the retirement system; or
 (3)  is a paid officer, employee, or consultant of a
 Texas trade association in the field of insurance or investment.
 (b)  A person is not eligible for appointment to a committee
 described by Subsection (a) if the person is required to register as
 a lobbyist under Chapter 305 because of the person's activities for
 compensation on behalf of a business or an association related to
 the investment of the assets of this state or of the retirement
 system.
 (c)  In this section, "Texas trade association" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 815.0031.
 Sec. 815.5093.  REVIEW OF AND REMOVAL FROM ADVISORY
 COMMITTEE ON INVESTMENTS. (a)  The board of trustees shall at
 least annually review the eligibility status of members serving on
 an advisory committee established to provide advice to the board on
 investments and investment-related issues.
 (b)  It is a ground for removal from a committee described by
 Subsection (a) that a person is:
 (1)  not qualified for appointment to the committee
 under Section 815.5091 or 815.5092;
 (2)  unable to discharge the person's duties on the
 committee because of illness, disability, or other personal
 circumstances; or
 (3)  absent from more than half of the scheduled
 meetings of the committee that the person is eligible to attend
 during a calendar year.
 (c)  If the executive director or a member of the advisory
 committee has knowledge that a potential ground for removal exists,
 the executive director or committee member shall notify the
 presiding officer of the board of trustees of the potential ground
 for removal.
 (d)  This section does not limit the power of the board of
 trustees to remove a person from the advisory committee under
 Section 815.509(a).
 (e)  The board of trustees may prescribe the process for
 removal from a committee described by Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *