Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2210 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 5, 2011      TO: Honorable Richard Pena Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2210 by Farias (Relating to the release of certain information regarding child fatalities resulting from abuse or neglect.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2210, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($692,498) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 5, 2011





  TO: Honorable Richard Pena Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2210 by Farias (Relating to the release of certain information regarding child fatalities resulting from abuse or neglect.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Richard Pena Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2210 by Farias (Relating to the release of certain information regarding child fatalities resulting from abuse or neglect.), As Introduced

 Honorable Richard Pena Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services 

 Honorable Richard Pena Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2210 by Farias (Relating to the release of certain information regarding child fatalities resulting from abuse or neglect.), As Introduced

HB2210 by Farias (Relating to the release of certain information regarding child fatalities resulting from abuse or neglect.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2210, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($692,498) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2210, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($692,498) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2012 ($276,999)   2013 ($415,499)   2014 ($415,499)   2015 ($415,499)   2016 ($415,499)    


2012 ($276,999)
2013 ($415,499)
2014 ($415,499)
2015 ($415,499)
2016 ($415,499)

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable (Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable (Cost) fromFederal Funds555    2012 ($276,999) ($63,536)   2013 ($415,499) ($95,304)   2014 ($415,499) ($95,304)   2015 ($415,499) ($95,304)   2016 ($415,499) ($95,304)   

  Fiscal Year Probable (Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable (Cost) fromFederal Funds555    2012 ($276,999) ($63,536)   2013 ($415,499) ($95,304)   2014 ($415,499) ($95,304)   2015 ($415,499) ($95,304)   2016 ($415,499) ($95,304)  


2012 ($276,999) ($63,536)
2013 ($415,499) ($95,304)
2014 ($415,499) ($95,304)
2015 ($415,499) ($95,304)
2016 ($415,499) ($95,304)

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend Section 261.203, Family Code, to require the Department of Family and Protective Services to provide certain information about child fatality investigations to judges across the state. The information would include the child's age, sex, date of death, who the child resided with, and a summary of previous reports, dispositions, services rendered, and assessment results. The bill would take effect on September 1, 2011.

Methodology

The agency estimates the bill would require judicial notification of 980 child abuse and neglect investigations involving a child fatality each year, including 950 child protective services cases and 30 residential child-care licensing cases. The agency also estimates the bill would require judicial notification of 230 completed investigations with a determination of death caused by abuse or neglect, including 227 child protective services cases and 3 residential child-care licensing cases. It is assumed the agency would use the health and human services enterprise print shop to copy and disseminate 1,210 reports to 506 judges across the state each year. The average cost per report would be $0.834, and the total cost would be $276,999 in General Revenue Funds ($340,535 All Funds) in fiscal year 2012, and $415,499 in General Revenue Funds ($510,803 All Funds) each following year. The first-year cost assumes the agency will begin providing judicial notification on January 1, 2012, following promulgation of administrative rules.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of

212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of

LBB Staff: JOB, CL, MB, NM, VJC, TB

 JOB, CL, MB, NM, VJC, TB