House | 05/06/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3138 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1104 | Journal Page: 3137 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Postponed | 5/6/11 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 3067 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3067 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Postponed | 5/5/11 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2755 |
House | 05/03/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2092 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2011 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 752 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 752 | |
House | 03/04/2011 | Filed |