House | 05/13/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3836 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB1496 | Journal Page: 3836 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2323 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1805 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 1765 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 1765 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 754 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 754 | |
House | 03/04/2011 | Filed |