Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2256 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Phillips (Senate Sponsor - Williams) H.B. No. 2256
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 20, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2011, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to abating or deferring the suspension or revocation of a
 license issued by the Department of Public Safety for victims of
 identity theft.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 411, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 411.0206 to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.0206.  ABATEMENT OR DEFERRAL FOR VICTIMS OF
 IDENTITY THEFT.  (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "License" means a license, certificate, permit, or
 other authorization issued by the department.
 (2)  "Victim of identity theft" means an individual who
 has filed a criminal complaint alleging the commission of an
 offense under Section 32.51, Penal Code, other than a person who is
 convicted of an offense under Section 37.08, Penal Code, with
 respect to that complaint.
 (b)  The department may abate or defer a mandatory suspension
 or revocation of a license if the license holder presents evidence
 acceptable to the department that:
 (1)  the license holder is the victim of identity
 theft; and
 (2)  the person against whom a criminal complaint
 alleging the commission of an offense under Section 32.51, Penal
 Code, has been filed, and not the license holder, engaged in the act
 or omission that mandates the suspension or revocation.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *