Senate | 05/11/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 1340 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1340 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1141 | |
House | 04/15/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1909 | |
House | 04/15/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1846 | |
House | 04/15/2011 | Record vote | RV#392 | Journal Page: 1846 |
House | 04/15/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1846 | |
House | 04/15/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1846 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1832 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Amended | 1-Phillips | Journal Page: 1832 |
House | 04/14/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1832 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1503 | |
House | 03/29/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2011 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 754 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 754 | |
House | 03/04/2011 | Filed |