E | 06/17/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6918 | |
E | 05/27/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6460 | |
Senate | 05/27/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4344 | |
House | 05/27/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6275 | |
House | 05/27/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6459 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5753 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3538 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3538 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3538 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3538 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3538 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3538 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3538 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2976 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2656 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1340 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1340 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1141 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1866 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1798 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Record vote | RV#375 | Journal Page: 1801 |
House | 04/14/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1801 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1801 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1788 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1788 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1599 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1106 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 755 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 755 | |
House | 03/04/2011 | Filed |