House | 05/09/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3249 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 198 | Journal Page: 3247 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1908 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1488 | |
House | 02/15/2011 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 354 | |
House | 02/15/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 354 | |
House | 11/09/2010 | Filed |