|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1525
|
Journal Page: 5809
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Corrected Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5040
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3055
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3054
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Carona
|
Journal Page: 3054
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 3054
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Returned to the Senate for further action
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Senate adopts resolution recalling from House
|
SCR 57
|
Journal Page: 2754
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4062
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA1 Carona
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA2 Carona
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Carona
|
Journal Page: 2340
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2340
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2340
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1705
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1705
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1367
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2392
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#511
|
Journal Page: 2194
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2194
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2194
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2177
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2185
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2185
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1835
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 756
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 756
|
House
|
03/04/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|