House | 04/20/2011 | Recommitted to committee | Journal Page: 2008 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Postponed | 4/21/11 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 1756 |
House | 04/13/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1756 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/01/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1463 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 757 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 757 | |
House | 03/04/2011 | Filed |